Peter Hyballa
www.fcdac.sk
- Date of birth/Age: Dec 5, 1975 (48)
- Place of birth: Bocholt
- Citizenship: Germany
- Coaching Licence : UEFA Pro Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 1.13 Years
- Preferred formation : 3-4-1-2
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | from / until | Days in charge | Matches | W | D | L | Players used | ø-Goals | PPM | Games / PPG | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAC Breda Manager | 22/23 (Jan 18, 2023) | 23/24 (Sep 13, 2023) | 22/23 (Jan 18, 2023) / 23/24 (Sep 13, 2023) | 238 Days | 28 | 15 | 2 | 11 | 39 | 1.89 : 1.64 | 1.68 | 28 / 1.68 | ||
AS Trencin Manager | 21/22 (Jul 1, 2022) | 22/23 (Jul 27, 2022) | 21/22 (Jul 1, 2022) / 22/23 (Jul 27, 2022) | 26 Days | 2 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 19 | 0.00 : 2.00 | 0.50 | 2 / 0.50 | ||
Türkgücü Münch. Manager | 21/22 (Sep 21, 2021) | 21/22 (Nov 23, 2021) | 21/22 (Sep 21, 2021) / 21/22 (Nov 23, 2021) | 63 Days | 1 | 0 | 0 | 1 | 23 | 0.13 : 0.38 | 0.00 | 1 / 0.00 | ||
Esbjerg fB Manager | 20/21 (May 31, 2021) | 21/22 (Aug 11, 2021) | 20/21 (May 31, 2021) / 21/22 (Aug 11, 2021) | 72 Days | 4 | 1 | 1 | 2 | 22 | 1.75 : 2.50 | 1.00 | 4 / 1.00 | ||
Wisla Kraków Manager | 20/21 (Dec 2, 2020) | 20/21 (May 14, 2021) | 20/21 (Dec 2, 2020) / 20/21 (May 14, 2021) | 163 Days | 18 | 5 | 5 | 8 | 31 | 1.11 : 1.33 | 1.11 | 18 / 1.11 | ||
NAC Breda Manager | 19/20 (Feb 3, 2020) | 20/21 (Jul 3, 2020) | 19/20 (Feb 3, 2020) / 20/21 (Jul 3, 2020) | 151 Days | 7 | 4 | 2 | 1 | 21 | 2.14 : 1.86 | 2.00 | 7 / 2.00 | ||
Dunajska Streda Manager | 18/19 (Jul 16, 2018) | 19/20 (Jan 3, 2020) | 18/19 (Jul 16, 2018) / 19/20 (Jan 3, 2020) | 536 Days | 64 | 37 | 10 | 17 | 43 | 2.05 : 1.44 | 1.89 | 64 / 1.89 | ||
Fußball-Lehrer-Ausbildung des DFB Chief instructor | 17/18 (May 23, 2018) | 18/19 (Jul 15, 2018) | 17/18 (May 23, 2018) / 18/19 (Jul 15, 2018) | 53 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
NEC Nijmegen Manager | 16/17 (Jul 1, 2016) | 16/17 (Apr 24, 2017) | 16/17 (Jul 1, 2016) / 16/17 (Apr 24, 2017) | 297 Days | 33 | 7 | 7 | 19 | 27 | 0.97 : 1.94 | 0.85 | 33 / 0.85 | ||
Leverkusen U19 Manager | 14/15 (Jul 1, 2014) | 15/16 (Jun 30, 2016) | 14/15 (Jul 1, 2014) / 15/16 (Jun 30, 2016) | 730 Days | 54 | 26 | 12 | 16 | 42 | 2.24 : 1.56 | 1.67 | 54 / 1.67 | ||
Leverkusen YL Manager | 14/15 (Jul 1, 2014) | 15/16 (Jun 30, 2016) | 14/15 (Jul 1, 2014) / 15/16 (Jun 30, 2016) | 730 Days | 12 | 4 | 2 | 6 | 35 | 1.50 : 1.92 | 1.17 | 12 / 1.17 | ||
B. Leverkusen Assistant Manager | 13/14 (Apr 7, 2014) | 13/14 (Jun 30, 2014) | 13/14 (Apr 7, 2014) / 13/14 (Jun 30, 2014) | 84 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Assistant Manager of: Sascha Lewandowski (5 Games) | ||||||||||||||
Sturm Graz Manager | 11/12 (May 14, 2012) | 12/13 (Apr 22, 2013) | 11/12 (May 14, 2012) / 12/13 (Apr 22, 2013) | 343 Days | 33 | 14 | 9 | 10 | 25 | 1.55 : 1.30 | 1.55 | 33 / 1.55 | ||
RB Juniors Manager | 11/12 (Jan 4, 2012) | 11/12 (May 13, 2012) | 11/12 (Jan 4, 2012) / 11/12 (May 13, 2012) | 130 Days | 11 | 5 | 3 | 3 | 23 | 2.64 : 1.55 | 1.64 | 11 / 1.64 | ||
Alem. Aachen Manager | 10/11 (Jul 1, 2010) | 11/12 (Sep 13, 2011) | 10/11 (Jul 1, 2010) / 11/12 (Sep 13, 2011) | 439 Days | 46 | 16 | 12 | 18 | 36 | 1.52 : 1.76 | 1.30 | 46 / 1.30 | ||
B. Dortmund U19 Manager | 07/08 (Jul 1, 2007) | 09/10 (Jun 30, 2010) | 07/08 (Jul 1, 2007) / 09/10 (Jun 30, 2010) | 1095 Days | 83 | 55 | 11 | 17 | 59 | 2.94 : 1.42 | 2.12 | 83 / 2.12 | ||
Wolfsburg U19 Manager | 05/06 (Jul 1, 2005) | 06/07 (Jun 30, 2007) | 05/06 (Jul 1, 2005) / 06/07 (Jun 30, 2007) | 729 Days | 53 | 32 | 8 | 13 | 40 | 2.06 : 1.11 | 1.96 | 53 / 1.96 | ||
Wolfsburg U17 Manager | 04/05 (Jul 1, 2004) | 04/05 (Jun 30, 2005) | 04/05 (Jul 1, 2004) / 04/05 (Jun 30, 2005) | 364 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Ramblers FC Manager | 02/03 (Jul 1, 2002) | 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | 02/03 (Jul 1, 2002) / 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | 364 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Bielefeld U19 Manager | 01/02 (Jul 1, 2001) | 01/02 (Jun 30, 2002) | 01/02 (Jul 1, 2001) / 01/02 (Jun 30, 2002) | 364 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Pr. Münster Assistant Manager | 00/01 (Jul 1, 2000) | 00/01 (Jun 30, 2001) | 00/01 (Jul 1, 2000) / 00/01 (Jun 30, 2001) | 364 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Assistant Manager of: Stefan Grädler (36 Games) | ||||||||||||||
Pr. Münster U17 Manager | 99/00 (Jul 1, 1999) | 00/01 (Jun 30, 2001) | 99/00 (Jul 1, 1999) / 00/01 (Jun 30, 2001) | 730 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Münster 08 U19 Manager | 98/99 (Jul 1, 1998) | 98/99 (Jun 30, 1999) | 98/99 (Jul 1, 1998) / 98/99 (Jun 30, 1999) | 364 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
1.FC Bocholt Youth Coach | 96/97 (Jul 1, 1996) | 97/98 (Jun 30, 1998) | 96/97 (Jul 1, 1996) / 97/98 (Jun 30, 1998) | 729 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
1.FC Bocholt U19 Manager | 96/97 (Jul 1, 1996) | 97/98 (Jun 30, 1998) | 96/97 (Jul 1, 1996) / 97/98 (Jun 30, 1998) | 729 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Bor. Bocholt Youth Coach | 93/94 (Jul 1, 1993) | 95/96 (Jun 30, 1996) | 93/94 (Jul 1, 1993) / 95/96 (Jun 30, 1996) | 1095 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - |